House
|
04/24/2023
|
Third Read and Defeated (H) - AYES: 65 NOES: 56 PRESENT: 31
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
Taken Up for Third Reading (H)
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 5 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Voted Do Pass (H)
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Executive Session Completed (H)
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Placed on the Informal Third Reading Calendar (H)
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Referred: Fiscal Review(H)
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1, HA 1 to HA 2, HA 2, as amended, HA 3, and HA 4, adopted.
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
HCS Adopted (H)
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Title of Bill - Agreed To
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Taken Up for Perfection (H)
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2023
|
Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2023
|
Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 4 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
HCS Voted Do Pass (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Public Hearing Completed (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Referred: Special Committee on Public Policy(H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/05/2023
|
Read Second Time (H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/04/2023
|
Read First Time (H)
|
|
|
House
|
12/01/2022
|
Prefiled (H)
|
|
|