House | 04/17/2023 | Referred: Rules - Regulatory Oversight(H) | ||
House | 04/13/2023 | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 17 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 | ||
House | 04/13/2023 | Voted Do Pass (H) | ||
House | 04/13/2023 | Executive Session Completed (H) | ||
House | 03/23/2023 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | ||
House | 03/02/2023 | Referred: Crime Prevention and Public Safety(H) | ||
House | 01/05/2023 | Read Second Time (H) | ||
House | 01/04/2023 | Read First Time (H) | ||
House | 12/01/2022 | Prefiled (H) |