Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Placed on Informal Calendar - SA 6 and SS, pending
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Placed on Informal Calendar - SA 5 and SS, pending
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
SS Offered
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Taken Up for Third Reading (S) - AYES: 22 NOES: 9 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Taken Up
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Reported Do Pass (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
Voted Do Pass (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
Executive Session Held (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2023
|
Executive Session Scheduled - Monday, April 17, 2023, 12:00 p.m., Senate Committee Room 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Referred: Fiscal Oversight(S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
SCS Reported Do Pass (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2023
|
SCS Voted Do Pass (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2023
|
Public Hearing Held (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2023
|
Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Monday, February 27, 2023, 1:30 p.m., Senate Committee Room 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2023
|
Second read and referred: Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence(S)
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2023
|
Reported to the Senate and First Read (S)
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2023
|
Emergency Clause Defeated (H) - AYES: 108 NOES: 38 PRESENT: 3
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2023
|
Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 109 NOES: 35 PRESENT: 1
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2023
|
Taken Up for Third Reading (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2023
|
Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 5 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2023
|
Voted Do Pass (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2023
|
Executive Session Completed (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2023
|
Referred: Fiscal Review(H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2023
|
Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1 to HA 1, HA 2 to HA 1, HA 3 to HA 1, HA 5 t o HA1, HA 9 to HA 1, HA 1, as amended, adopted.
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2023
|
HCS Adopted (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2023
|
Laid Over (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2023
|
Title of Bill - Agreed To
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2023
|
Taken Up for Perfection (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2023
|
Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 6 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2023
|
Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2023
|
HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 19 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 1
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2023
|
HCS Voted Do Pass (H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/30/2023
|
Public Hearing Completed (H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2023
|
Public Hearing Continued (H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/17/2023
|
Referred: Crime Prevention and Public Safety(H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/05/2023
|
Read Second Time (H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/04/2023
|
Read First Time (H)
|
|
|
House
|
12/01/2022
|
Prefiled (H)
|
|
|