Senate | 05/04/2023 | Reported Do Pass (S) | ||
Senate | 05/03/2023 | Voted Do Pass (S) | ||
Senate | 05/03/2023 | Executive Session Held (S) | ||
Senate | 05/03/2023 | Public Hearing Held (S) | ||
Senate | 05/02/2023 | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Wednesday, May 3, 2023, 8:30 a.m., Senate Committee Room 1 | ||
Senate | 05/02/2023 | Second read and referred: Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety(S) | ||
House | 05/01/2023 | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) | ||
House | 05/01/2023 | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 153 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 | ||
House | 05/01/2023 | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) | ||
House | 04/26/2023 | Perfected (H) | ||
House | 04/26/2023 | Title of Bill - Agreed To | ||
House | 04/26/2023 | Taken Up for Perfection (H) | ||
House | 04/20/2023 | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 | ||
House | 04/19/2023 | Voted Do Pass (H) | ||
House | 04/19/2023 | Executive Session Completed (H) | ||
House | 04/17/2023 | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) | ||
House | 04/13/2023 | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 17 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 | ||
House | 04/06/2023 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | ||
House | 03/02/2023 | Referred: Crime Prevention and Public Safety(H) | ||
House | 01/05/2023 | Read Second Time (H) | ||
House | 01/04/2023 | Read First Time (H) | ||
House | 12/06/2022 | Prefiled (H) |