Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Public Hearing Held (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Tuesday, April 25, 2023, 8:00 a.m., Senate Lounge
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Second read and referred: Education and Workforce Development(S)
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Reported to the Senate and First Read (S)
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 107 NOES: 17 PRESENT: 23
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Taken Up for Third Reading (H)
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 4 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Voted Do Pass (H)
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Executive Session Completed (H)
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
Referred: Fiscal Review(H)
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1 and HA 2, adopted.
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
HCS Adopted (H)
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Title of Bill - Agreed To
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Taken Up for Perfection (H)
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H)
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2023
|
Placed Back on Formal Perfection Calendar (H)
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2023
|
Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
HCS Voted Do Pass (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
Public Hearing Completed (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2023
|
Referred: Government Efficiency and Downsizing(H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/05/2023
|
Read Second Time (H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/04/2023
|
Read First Time (H)
|
|
|
House
|
12/19/2022
|
Prefiled (H)
|
|
|