House | 05/01/2023 | Placed on the Informal Third Reading Calendar (H) | ||
House | 04/20/2023 | Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1, adopted. | ||
House | 04/20/2023 | HCS Adopted (H) | ||
House | 04/20/2023 | Title of Bill - Agreed To | ||
House | 04/20/2023 | Taken Up for Perfection (H) | ||
House | 04/06/2023 | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) | ||
House | 04/05/2023 | Placed Back on Formal Perfection Calendar (H) | ||
House | 03/27/2023 | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0 | ||
House | 03/27/2023 | Voted Do Pass (H) | ||
House | 03/27/2023 | Executive Session Completed (H) | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 6 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 2 | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | ||
House | 03/02/2023 | Referred: Professional Registration and Licensing(H) | ||
House | 01/05/2023 | Read Second Time (H) | ||
House | 01/04/2023 | Read First Time (H) | ||
House | 12/01/2022 | Prefiled (H) |