House | 04/12/2023 | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 5 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0 | ||
House | 04/12/2023 | Voted Do Pass (H) | ||
House | 04/12/2023 | Executive Session Completed (H) | ||
House | 04/06/2023 | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) | ||
House | 03/23/2023 | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 13 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) | ||
House | 03/08/2023 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | ||
House | 03/02/2023 | Referred: Government Efficiency and Downsizing(H) | ||
House | 01/05/2023 | Read Second Time (H) | ||
House | 01/04/2023 | Read First Time (H) | ||
House | 12/28/2022 | Prefiled (H) |