House | 05/05/2023 | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) | ||
House | 05/03/2023 | Placed Back on Formal Perfection Calendar (H) | ||
House | 04/12/2023 | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 | ||
House | 04/12/2023 | Voted Do Pass (H) | ||
House | 04/12/2023 | Executive Session Completed (H) | ||
House | 04/05/2023 | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) | ||
House | 03/30/2023 | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 | ||
House | 03/20/2023 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | ||
House | 03/02/2023 | Referred: Rural Community Development(H) | ||
House | 01/05/2023 | Read Second Time (H) | ||
House | 01/04/2023 | Read First Time (H) | ||
House | 12/28/2022 | Prefiled (H) |