House | 04/17/2023 | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) | ||
House | 04/05/2023 | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 1 | ||
House | 03/30/2023 | Voted Do Pass (H) | ||
House | 03/30/2023 | Executive Session Completed (H) | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Returned to Committee of Origin (H) - Transportation Accountability AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Voted to Return to the Committee of Origin (H) | ||
House | 03/09/2023 | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 12 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 | ||
House | 02/16/2023 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | ||
House | 02/02/2023 | Referred: Transportation Accountability(H) | ||
House | 01/05/2023 | Read Second Time (H) | ||
House | 01/04/2023 | Read First Time (H) | ||
House | 12/28/2022 | Prefiled (H) |