House | 04/06/2023 | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 21 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 2 | ||
House | 04/06/2023 | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) | ||
House | 04/06/2023 | Executive Session Completed (H) | ||
House | 02/16/2023 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | ||
House | 01/25/2023 | Referred: Crime Prevention and Public Safety(H) | ||
House | 01/05/2023 | Read Second Time (H) | ||
House | 01/04/2023 | Read First Time (H) | ||
House | 01/03/2023 | Prefiled (H) |