Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Reported Do Pass (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Voted Do Pass (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Executive Session Held (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Public Hearing Held (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2023
|
Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Tuesday, April 25, 2023, 10:00 a.m., Senate Committee Room 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Second read and referred: Emerging Issues(S)
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Reported to the Senate and First Read (S)
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 108 NOES: 45 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Taken Up for Third Reading (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Perfected (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
HCS Adopted (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Title of Bill - Agreed To
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Taken Up for Perfection (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2023
|
Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2023
|
Voted Do Pass (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2023
|
Executive Session Completed (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 13 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2023
|
HCS Voted Do Pass (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Public Hearing Completed (H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2023
|
Referred: Local Government(H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/05/2023
|
Read Second Time (H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/04/2023
|
Introduced and Read First Time (H)
|
|
|