Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Referred: Fiscal Oversight(S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Reported Do Pass (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Voted Do Pass (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Executive Session Held (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2023
|
Public Hearing Held (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Wednesday, April 5, 2023, 8:15 a.m., Senate Committee Room 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Second read and referred: Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety(S)
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2023
|
Reported to the Senate and First Read (S)
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2023
|
Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 113 NOES: 40 PRESENT: 3
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2023
|
Taken Up for Third Reading (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2023
|
Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 5 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2023
|
Voted Do Pass (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2023
|
Executive Session Completed (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Referred: Fiscal Review(H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1, HA 2, HA 1 to HA 3, HA 3, as amended, HA 4, HA 1 to HA 5 and HA 5, as amended, adopted.
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
HCS Adopted (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
Title of Bill - Agreed To
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2023
|
Taken Up for Perfection (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2023
|
Reported Do Pass (H) - with a time limit of 3 hours and 30 minutes of debate on Perfection pursuant to Rule (24)(28). AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2023
|
Rules - Voted Do Pass with Time Limit (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2023
|
Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2023
|
HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 20 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2023
|
HCS Voted Do Pass (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2023
|
Public Hearing Completed (H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/23/2023
|
Referred: Crime Prevention and Public Safety(H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/09/2023
|
Read Second Time (H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/05/2023
|
Introduced and Read First Time (H)
|
|
|