Senate | 05/03/2023 | Public Hearing Held (S) | ||
Senate | 04/28/2023 | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Wednesday, May 3, 2023, 11:00 a.m., Senate Lounge | ||
Senate | 04/27/2023 | Second read and referred: Veterans, Military Affairs and Pensions(S) | ||
House | 04/20/2023 | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) | ||
House | 04/19/2023 | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 150 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 2 | ||
House | 04/19/2023 | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) | ||
House | 04/17/2023 | Perfected (H) | ||
House | 04/17/2023 | Title of Bill - Agreed To | ||
House | 04/17/2023 | Taken Up for Perfection (H) | ||
House | 04/11/2023 | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 | ||
House | 04/11/2023 | Voted Do Pass (H) | ||
House | 04/11/2023 | Executive Session Completed (H) | ||
House | 04/03/2023 | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) | ||
House | 03/28/2023 | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | ||
House | 03/09/2023 | Referred: Veterans(H) | ||
House | 01/19/2023 | Read Second Time (H) | ||
House | 01/18/2023 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |