COMMITTEE ON LEGISLATIVE RESEARCH OVERSIGHT DIVISION FISCAL NOTE L.R. No.:1829H.01P Bill No.:Perfected HB 836 Subject:Veterans; Department of Public Safety; Military Affairs Type:Original Date:April 18, 2023Bill Summary:This proposal establishes the Operation Enduring Freedom, Operation Freedom’s Sentinel and Operation Allies Refuge Program which authorizes the issuance of a medallion, medal, and certificate to certain veterans who served in specified conflicts. FISCAL SUMMARY ESTIMATED NET EFFECT ON GENERAL REVENUE FUNDFUND AFFECTEDFY 2024FY 2025FY 2026Total Estimated Net Effect on General Revenue $0$0$0 ESTIMATED NET EFFECT ON OTHER STATE FUNDSFUND AFFECTEDFY 2024FY 2025FY 2026Veterans Commission Capital Improvement Trust Fund (0304) Less than ($73,000) Less than ($73,000) Less than ($73,000) Total Estimated Net Effect on Other State Funds Less than ($73,000) Less than ($73,000) Less than ($73,000) Numbers within parentheses: () indicate costs or losses. L.R. No. 1829H.01P Bill No. Perfected HB 836 Page 2 of April 18, 2023 DD:LR:OD ESTIMATED NET EFFECT ON FEDERAL FUNDSFUND AFFECTEDFY 2024FY 2025FY 2026Total Estimated Net Effect on All Federal Funds $0$0$0 ESTIMATED NET EFFECT ON FULL TIME EQUIVALENT (FTE)FUND AFFECTEDFY 2024FY 2025FY 2026Total Estimated Net Effect on FTE 000 ☐ Estimated Net Effect (expenditures or reduced revenues) expected to exceed $250,000 in any of the three fiscal years after implementation of the act or at full implementation of the act. ☐ Estimated Net Effect (savings or increased revenues) expected to exceed $250,000 in any of the three fiscal years after implementation of the act or at full implementation of the act. ESTIMATED NET EFFECT ON LOCAL FUNDSFUND AFFECTEDFY 2024FY 2025FY 2026Local Government$0$0$0 L.R. No. 1829H.01P Bill No. Perfected HB 836 Page 3 of April 18, 2023 DD:LR:OD FISCAL ANALYSIS ASSUMPTION §43.212 – Medallion program Officials from the Missouri National Guard (MNG) state with an estimated 73,000 active and registered veterans, HB 836 will have an approximate $1,000 - $1,095,000 fiscal impact to the Veterans Recognition program, which is funded by the Veterans Commission Capital Improvement Trust Fund, depending on the number of approved applicants. The estimated cost per medal and postage is $15. Listed below are the number of medals awarded to the following programs: 2000 – WWII medals awarded 18,554 since inception 2003 – Korean War medals awarded 31,524 since inception 2006 – Vietnam War medals awarded 47,038 since inception 2019 – Operation Desert Storm/Desert Shield and Operation Iraqi Freedom/New Dawn medals awarded 931 since inception Oversight contacted the MNG to inquire how many personnel deployed to Operation Enduring Freedom, Operation Freedom’s Sentinel, and Operation Allies Refuge Program. However, Oversight has not received that information yet. Therefore, using MNG’s estimate of 73,000 current Missouri veterans, Oversight will assume approximately 40 percent of those served during this timeframe (10/7/2001 – 8/30/2021). Oversight also assumes approximately half or 14,600 (73,000 * .40 *.50) service members and registered veterans will apply for the medal. 14,600 x $15 = $219,000 Based on the implementation of other similar programs, Oversight will reflect this cost spread over the three years ($219,000 / 3 = $73,000) of the fiscal note to the Veterans Commission Capital Improvement Trust Fund. Oversight notes the ending balance in the Veterans Commission Capital Improvement Trust Fund (0304) as of March 31, 2023, is $31,649,894. Officials from the Office of Administration assume the proposal will have no fiscal impact on their organization. Oversight does not have any information to the contrary. Therefore, Oversight will reflect a zero impact in the fiscal note. Officials from the Department of Public Safety – Missouri Veterans Commission defer to the Missouri National Guard for the potential fiscal impact of this proposal. L.R. No. 1829H.01P Bill No. Perfected HB 836 Page 4 of April 18, 2023 DD:LR:OD FISCAL IMPACT – State GovernmentFY 2024 (10 Mo.) FY 2025FY 2026VETERANS COMMISSION CAPITAL IMPROVEMENTS TRUST FUND (0304) Cost – MNG (§43.212) New medallion program Less than ($73,000) Less than ($73,000) Less than ($73,000) ESTIMATED NET EFFECT TO THE VETERANS COMMISSION CAPITAL IMPROVEMENTS TRUST FUND Less than ($73,000) Less than ($73,000) Less than ($73,000) FISCAL IMPACT – Local GovernmentFY 2024 (10 Mo.) FY 2025FY 2026$0$0$0 FISCAL IMPACT – Small Business No direct fiscal impact to small businesses would be expected as a result of this proposal. FISCAL DESCRIPTION MILITARY MEDAL PROGRAMS (Section 43.212) This bill establishes the "Operation Enduring Freedom, Operation Freedom’s Sentinel, and Operation Allies Refuge Program". This Program would award medallions, medals, and certificates of appreciation to veterans who honorably served on active duty in the United States military service at any time between October 7, 2011, and August 30, 2021, and who were honorably separated and discharged from military service. This legislation is not federally mandated, would not duplicate any other program and would not require additional capital improvements or rental space. L.R. No. 1829H.01P Bill No. Perfected HB 836 Page 5 of April 18, 2023 DD:LR:OD SOURCES OF INFORMATION Department of Public Safety – Missouri Veterans Commission Missouri National Guard Office of Administration Julie MorffRoss StropeDirectorAssistant DirectorApril 18, 2023April 18, 2023