Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Executive Session Held (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Executive Session Scheduled - AMENDED: Thursday, April 27, 2023, April 27, 2023, 8:00 a.m., Senate Lounge
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Executive Session Scheduled - Thursday, April 27, 2023, April 27, 2023, 8:00 a.m., Senate Lounge
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Second read and referred: Governmental Accountability(S)
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
Reported to the Senate and First Read (S)
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 105 NOES: 42 PRESENT: 3
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
Taken Up for Third Reading (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
Placed on the Informal Third Reading Calendar (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Perfected (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
HCS Adopted (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Title of Bill - Agreed To
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Taken Up for Perfection (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 5 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Voted Do Pass (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Executive Session Completed (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2023
|
Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
HCS Voted Do Pass (H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2023
|
Public Hearing Completed (H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2023
|
Referred: Children and Families(H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2023
|
Read Second Time (H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/23/2023
|
Introduced and Read First Time (H)
|
|
|