House | 04/18/2023 | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 | ||
House | 03/20/2023 | Voted Do Pass (H) | ||
House | 03/20/2023 | Executive Session Completed (H) | ||
House | 03/09/2023 | Action Postponed (H) | ||
House | 03/09/2023 | Executive Session Continued | ||
House | 03/06/2023 | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) | ||
House | 03/01/2023 | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 11 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0 | ||
House | 02/21/2023 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | ||
House | 02/08/2023 | Referred: Local Government(H) | ||
House | 01/30/2023 | Read Second Time (H) | ||
House | 01/26/2023 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |