LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Missouri MO
Legislatures
2023 Regular Session
House
Bills
HB982
Action History
MO
Missouri House Bill HB982
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Missouri 2023 Regular Session
Missouri House Bill HB982
Action History
House
02/27/2023
HCS Voted Do Pass (H)
House
02/27/2023
Executive Session Completed (H)
House
02/13/2023
Public Hearing Completed (H)
House
02/02/2023
Referred: Rural Community Development(H)
House
01/30/2023
Read Second Time (H)
House
01/26/2023
Introduced and Read First Time (H)