Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Public Hearing Held (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Monday, May 1, 2023, 2:30 p.m., Senate Committee Room 2
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Second read and referred: Local Government and Elections(S)
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2023
|
Reported to the Senate and First Read (S)
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2023
|
Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 123 NOES: 12 PRESENT: 20
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2023
|
Taken Up for Third Reading (H)
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2023
|
Placed on the Informal Third Reading Calendar (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2023
|
Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1, HA 2 and HA 3, adopted.
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2023
|
HCS Adopted (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2023
|
Title of Bill - Agreed To
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2023
|
Taken Up for Perfection (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Voted Do Pass (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Executive Session Completed (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
HCS Voted Do Pass (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2023
|
Public Hearing Completed (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2023
|
Referred: Government Efficiency and Downsizing(H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/30/2023
|
Read Second Time (H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2023
|
Introduced and Read First Time (H)
|
|
|