House | 04/24/2023 | Action Postponed (H) | ||
House | 04/24/2023 | Executive Session Continued | ||
House | 04/17/2023 | Motion to Do Pass Failed (H) | ||
House | 04/17/2023 | Executive Session Completed (H) | ||
House | 04/12/2023 | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) | ||
House | 04/11/2023 | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 0 | ||
House | 04/05/2023 | Voted Do Pass (H) | ||
House | 03/08/2023 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | ||
House | 02/15/2023 | Referred: Emerging Issues(H) | ||
House | 01/05/2023 | Read Second Time (H) | ||
House | 01/04/2023 | Read First Time (H) | ||
House | 12/01/2022 | Prefiled (H) |