House | 04/18/2023 | Adopted (H) - HA 1, adopted. AYES: 111 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 31 | ||
House | 04/18/2023 | Taken Up | ||
House | 04/12/2023 | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 5 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 1 | ||
House | 04/12/2023 | Voted Do Pass (H) | ||
House | 04/12/2023 | Executive Session Completed (H) | ||
House | 04/06/2023 | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) | ||
House | 04/05/2023 | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | ||
House | 02/23/2023 | Referred: Special Committee on Tourism(H) | ||
House | 02/16/2023 | Offered (H) |