Senate
|
07/06/2023
|
Signed by Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2023
|
Delivered to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2023
|
Signed by House Speaker
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2023
|
Signed by Senate President Pro Tem
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2023
|
Reported Duly Enrolled Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2023
|
Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2023
|
CCS H Third Read and Passed - EC defeated
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2023
|
H adopts CCR
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
CCS S Third Read and Passed - EC adopted
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
CCR S offered & adopted (Black)--(0779S09.1SR)
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
H distributes CCR/CCS-(0779S.09S)
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
Corrected: House conferees appointed: Coleman, Sassmann, Dinkins, R. Brown, Lewis (25)
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2023
|
Senate conferees appointed: Black, Thompson Rehder, Eslinger, Arthur, Beck
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2023
|
House conf. appointed: Coleman, Sassmann, Dinkins, R. Brown, Lewis (6)
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2023
|
H refuses to recede and grants conference
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
S refuses to concur in HCS, as amended and requests H recede or grant conference
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
H Third Read and Passed - EC adopted
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
HCS, as amended, H adopted
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
HA 11 to HCS, as amended, H adopted --(0779H05.20H)
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
HA 1 to HA 11 to HCS H offered & adopted (Dinkins)--(0779H05.32H)
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
HA 11 to HCS H offered (Murphy)--(0779H05.20H)
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
HA 10 to HCS, as amended, H adopted --(0779H05.09H)
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
HA 1 to HA 10 to HCS H offered & adopted (Peters)--(0779H05.26H)
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
HA 10 to HCS H offered (Schwadron)--(0779H05.09H)
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
HA 9 to HCS, as amended, H adopted --(0779H05.17H)
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
HA 1 to HA 9 to HCS H offered & adopted (Veit)--(0779H05.28H)
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
HA 9 to HCS H offered (Stinnett)--(0779H05.17H)
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
HA 8 to HCS H offered & adopted (Keathley)--(0779H05.16H)
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
HA 7 to HCS H offered & adopted (Gregory)--(0779H05.04H)
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
HA 6 to HCS, as amended, H adopted --(0779H05.21H)
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
HA 1 to HA 6 to HCS H offered & adopted (Shields)--(0779H05.25H)
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
HA 6 to HCS H offered (Sassmann)--(0779H05.21H)
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
HA 5 to HCS H offered & adopted (Cook)--(0779H05.08H)
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
HA 4 to HCS H offered & adopted (Davidson)--(0779H05.11H)
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
HA 3 to HCS H offered & adopted (Haden)--(0779H05.01H)
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
HA 2 to HCS H offered & adopted (Perkins)--(0779H05.05H)
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
HA 1 to HCS H offered & adopted (Veit)--(0779H05.07H)
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Reported Do Pass H Fiscal Review
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Voted Do Pass H Fiscal Review
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Referred H Fiscal Review
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
HCS Reported Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
HCS Voted Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
Referred H Rules - Administrative Oversight
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
HCS Reported Do Pass H Professional Registration and Licensing
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
HCS Voted Do Pass H Professional Registration and Licensing
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Hearing Conducted H Professional Registration and Licensing
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Referred H Professional Registration and Licensing
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
H Second Read
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2023
|
H First Read
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
S Third Read and Passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2023
|
Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Perfected
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
SS for SCS, as amended, S adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
SA 3 to SS for SCS S offered & defeated (Mosley)--(0779S03.06S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
SA 2 to SS for SCS, as amended, S adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
SA 1 to SA 2 to SS for SCS S offered & adopted (Trent)--(0779S03.10S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
SA 2 to SS for SCS S offered (Schroer)--(0779S03.13S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
SA 1 to SS for SCS S withdrawn
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
SSA 1 for SA 1 to SS for SCS S withdrawn
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Bill Placed on Informal Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
SSA 1 for SA 1 to SS for SCS S offered (Schroer)--(0779S03.04S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
SA 1 to SS for SCS S offered (Schroer)--(0779S03.03S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
SS for SCS S offered (Black)--(0779S.03F)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2023
|
Reported from S Governmental Accountability Committee w/SCS
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2023
|
SCS Voted Do Pass S Governmental Accountability Committee (0779S.02C)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2023
|
Hearing Conducted S Governmental Accountability Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2023
|
Second Read and Referred S Governmental Accountability Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/04/2023
|
S First Read
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/01/2022
|
Prefiled
|
|
|