LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Missouri MO
Legislatures
2023 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB157
Draft Versions
MO
Missouri Senate Bill SB157
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Missouri 2023 Regular Session
Missouri Senate Bill SB157
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Fiscal Note
June 15, 2023
Fiscal Note
May 9, 2023
Fiscal Note
April 25, 2023
Fiscal Note
Fiscal Note
Fiscal Note
Enrolled
Bill
May 24, 2023
Compare
Comm Sub
Bill
April 24, 2023
Compare