Senate | 05/12/2023 | Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection | ||
Senate | 02/14/2023 | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar | ||
Senate | 02/09/2023 | Reported from S Local Government and Elections Committee | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | Voted Do Pass S Local Government and Elections Committee | ||
Senate | 01/23/2023 | Hearing Conducted S Local Government and Elections Committee | ||
Senate | 01/12/2023 | Second Read and Referred S Local Government and Elections Committee | ||
Senate | 01/04/2023 | S First Read | ||
Senate | 12/01/2022 | Prefiled |