House
|
06/07/2023
|
Signed by Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2023
|
Delivered to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2023
|
Signed by House Speaker
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2023
|
Signed by Senate President Pro Tem
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2023
|
Reported Duly Enrolled Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
H Third Read and Passed
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Reported Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Voted Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Referred H Rules - Legislative Oversight
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
Reported Do Pass H General Laws
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
Voted Do Pass H General Laws
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Hearing Conducted H General Laws
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Referred H General Laws
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
H Second Read
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
H First Read
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
S Third Read and Passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2023
|
Perfected
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2023
|
SS#2 for SCS S offered & adopted (Moon, et al)--(0202S.20F)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2023
|
SS for SCS S withdrawn
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
Taken up for Perfection
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
Bill Placed on Informal Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
SA 1 to SA 1 to SS for SCS S offered (Brattin)--(0202S05.01S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
SA 1 to SS for SCS S offered (Moon)--(0202S04.02S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
SS for SCS S offered (Moon, et al)--(0202S.04F)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2023
|
Reported from S Emerging Issues Committee w/SCS
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2023
|
SCS Voted Do Pass (w/SCSs SB 49, 236, &164) Emerging Issues Committee (0202S.02C)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2023
|
Hearing Conducted S Emerging Issues Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/12/2023
|
Second Read and Referred S Emerging Issues Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/04/2023
|
S First Read
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/01/2022
|
Prefiled
|
|
|