Senate | 04/11/2024 | Second read and referred: Emerging Issues(S) | ||
House | 03/27/2024 | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) | ||
House | 03/27/2024 | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 108 NOES: 46 PRESENT: 0 | ||
House | 03/27/2024 | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) | ||
House | 03/27/2024 | Placed on the Informal Third Reading Calendar (H) | ||
House | 03/14/2024 | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 3 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0 | ||
House | 03/14/2024 | Voted Do Pass (H) | ||
House | 03/14/2024 | Executive Session Completed (H) | ||
House | 03/13/2024 | Referred: Fiscal Review(H) | ||
House | 03/12/2024 | Perfected (H) | ||
House | 03/12/2024 | HCS Adopted (H) | ||
House | 03/12/2024 | Title of Bill - Agreed To | ||
House | 03/12/2024 | Taken Up for Perfection (H) | ||
House | 03/06/2024 | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) | ||
House | 03/04/2024 | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 6 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0 | ||
House | 02/29/2024 | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) | ||
House | 02/28/2024 | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0 | ||
House | 02/19/2024 | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) | ||
House | 01/29/2024 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | ||
House | 01/25/2024 | Referred: Special Committee on Homeland Security(H) | ||
House | 01/04/2024 | Read Second Time (H) | ||
House | 01/03/2024 | Read First Time (H) | ||
House | 12/01/2023 | Prefiled (H) |