Missouri 2024 Regular Session

Missouri House Bill HB1413 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note March 12, 2024
Fiscal Note February 28, 2024
Fiscal Note January 26, 2024
Bill December 1, 2023

Engrossed

Bill March 12, 2024

Comm Sub

Analysis March 13, 2024
Analysis February 29, 2024
Bill February 28, 2024
Analysis December 8, 2023