House | 04/29/2024 | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0 | ||
House | 04/29/2024 | Voted Do Pass (H) | ||
House | 04/29/2024 | Executive Session Completed (H) | ||
House | 04/25/2024 | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) | ||
House | 04/24/2024 | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 0 | ||
House | 04/23/2024 | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) | ||
House | 04/03/2024 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | ||
House | 03/14/2024 | Referred: Special Committee on Government Accountability(H) | ||
House | 01/04/2024 | Read Second Time (H) | ||
House | 01/03/2024 | Read First Time (H) | ||
House | 12/01/2023 | Prefiled (H) |