LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Missouri MO
Legislatures
2024 Regular Session
House
Bills
HB1509
Draft Versions
MO
Missouri House Bill HB1509
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Missouri 2024 Regular Session
Missouri House Bill HB1509
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Fiscal Note
April 25, 2024
Fiscal Note
April 1, 2024
Bill
December 1, 2023
Compare
Comm Sub
Analysis
April 26, 2024
Bill
April 24, 2024
Compare
Analysis
December 18, 2023