House | 05/07/2024 | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) | ||
House | 05/02/2024 | Placed Back on Formal Perfection Calendar (H) | ||
House | 03/11/2024 | Laid Over (H) - HA 1, pending | ||
House | 03/11/2024 | Title of Bill - Agreed To | ||
House | 03/11/2024 | Taken Up for Perfection (H) | ||
House | 03/04/2024 | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0 | ||
House | 03/04/2024 | Voted Do Pass (H) | ||
House | 03/04/2024 | Executive Session Completed (H) | ||
House | 02/29/2024 | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) | ||
House | 02/26/2024 | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 1 | ||
House | 01/31/2024 | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) | ||
House | 01/24/2024 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | ||
House | 01/11/2024 | Referred: Government Efficiency and Downsizing(H) | ||
House | 01/04/2024 | Read Second Time (H) | ||
House | 01/03/2024 | Read First Time (H) | ||
House | 12/01/2023 | Prefiled (H) |