Senate
|
04/29/2024
|
SCS Voted Do Pass (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2024
|
Executive Session Held (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2024
|
Public Hearing Held (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2024
|
Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Monday, April 22, 2024, 2:00 p.m., Senate Committee Room 1.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2024
|
Second read and referred: Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence(S)
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2024
|
Reported to the Senate and First Read (S)
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2024
|
Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 107 NOES: 25 PRESENT: 18
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2024
|
Taken Up for Third Reading (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2024
|
Placed on the Informal Third Reading Calendar (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2024
|
Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 5 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2024
|
Voted Do Pass (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2024
|
Executive Session Completed (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
Referred: Fiscal Review(H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1 to HA 1 and HA 1, as amended, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
HCS Adopted (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
Taken Up
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2024
|
Laid Over (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2024
|
Title of Bill - Agreed To
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2024
|
Taken Up for Perfection (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2024
|
Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 6 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 1
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 19 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
HCS Voted Do Pass (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
Action Postponed (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2024
|
Executive Session Continued
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2024
|
Public Hearing Completed (H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/05/2024
|
Referred: Crime Prevention and Public Safety(H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/04/2024
|
Read Second Time (H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/03/2024
|
Read First Time (H)
|
|
|
House
|
12/01/2023
|
Prefiled (H)
|
|
|