Missouri 2024 Regular Session

Missouri House Bill HB1692 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note March 13, 2024
Fiscal Note February 23, 2024
Fiscal Note January 5, 2024
Bill December 4, 2023

Engrossed

Bill March 12, 2024

Comm Sub

Analysis March 13, 2024
Analysis February 23, 2024
Bill February 22, 2024
Analysis January 5, 2024