House
|
04/02/2024
|
SCS Voted Do Pass (S)
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2024
|
Executive Session Held (S)
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2024
|
Executive Session Scheduled - Tuesday, April 2, 2024, 1:00 p.m., Senate Committee Room 1
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2024
|
Public Hearing Held (S)
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2024
|
Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Monday, March 25, 2024, 2:00 p.m., Senate Committee Room 2
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Second read and referred: Local Government and Elections(S)
|
|
|
House
|
02/12/2024
|
Read First Time (S)
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2024
|
Delivered to the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2024
|
Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 141 NOES: 5 PRESENT: 7
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2024
|
Taken Up for Third Reading (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2024
|
Placed on the Informal Third Reading Calendar (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2024
|
Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1, adopted.
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2024
|
HCS Adopted (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2024
|
Title of Bill - Agreed To
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2024
|
Taken Up for Perfection (H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/29/2024
|
Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
House
|
01/29/2024
|
Voted Do Pass (H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/29/2024
|
Executive Session Completed (H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2024
|
Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2024
|
HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 11 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
House
|
01/23/2024
|
HCS Voted Do Pass (H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/16/2024
|
Public Hearing Completed (H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/05/2024
|
Referred: Local Government(H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/04/2024
|
Read Second Time (H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/03/2024
|
Read First Time (H)
|
|
|
House
|
12/04/2023
|
Prefiled (H)
|
|
|