Missouri 2024 Regular Session

Missouri House Bill HB1720 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note February 6, 2024
Fiscal Note January 26, 2024
Fiscal Note January 15, 2024
Bill December 4, 2023

Engrossed

Bill February 6, 2024

Comm Sub

Analysis February 7, 2024
Analysis January 25, 2024
Bill January 24, 2024
Analysis January 2, 2024