Senate
|
04/02/2024
|
Voted Do Pass (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2024
|
Executive Session Held (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2024
|
Executive Session Scheduled - Tuesday, April 2, 2024, 1:00 p.m., Senate Committee Room 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2024
|
Public Hearing Held (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2024
|
Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Monday, March 25, 2024, 2:00 p.m., Senate Committee Room 2
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Second read and referred: Local Government and Elections(S)
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Reported to the Senate and First Read (S)
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 104 NOES: 41 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Taken Up for Third Reading (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1, adopted AYES: 107 NOES: 49 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
HCS Adopted (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Title of Bill - Agreed To
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Taken Up for Perfection (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2024
|
Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
House
|
02/12/2024
|
Voted Do Pass (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/12/2024
|
Executive Session Completed (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2024
|
Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2024
|
HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 12 NOES: 5 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
House
|
01/30/2024
|
HCS Voted Do Pass (H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/23/2024
|
Public Hearing Completed (H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2024
|
Referred: Elections and Elected Officials(H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/04/2024
|
Read Second Time (H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/03/2024
|
Read First Time (H)
|
|
|
House
|
12/05/2023
|
Prefiled (H)
|
|
|