Missouri 2024 Regular Session

Missouri House Bill HB1749 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note February 21, 2024
Fiscal Note February 2, 2024
Fiscal Note January 21, 2024
Bill December 5, 2023

Engrossed

Bill February 20, 2024

Comm Sub

Analysis February 21, 2024
Analysis February 5, 2024
Bill February 1, 2024
Analysis January 19, 2024