House | 05/16/2024 | Dropped from Calendar - Pursuant to House Rules (H) | ||
House | 05/01/2024 | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) | ||
House | 04/15/2024 | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 6 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0 | ||
House | 04/15/2024 | Voted Do Pass (H) | ||
House | 04/15/2024 | Executive Session Completed (H) | ||
House | 04/11/2024 | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) | ||
House | 04/03/2024 | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 11 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0 | ||
House | 03/13/2024 | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) | ||
House | 03/11/2024 | Action Postponed (H) | ||
House | 03/11/2024 | Executive Session Continued | ||
House | 02/26/2024 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | ||
House | 01/05/2024 | Referred: Special Committee on Government Accountability(H) | ||
House | 01/04/2024 | Read Second Time (H) | ||
House | 01/03/2024 | Read First Time (H) | ||
House | 12/05/2023 | Prefiled (H) |