House | 04/30/2024 | Voted Do Pass (H) | ||
House | 04/30/2024 | Executive Session Completed (H) | ||
House | 04/23/2024 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | ||
House | 04/17/2024 | Referred: Special Committee on Innovation and Technology(H) | ||
House | 01/04/2024 | Read Second Time (H) | ||
House | 01/03/2024 | Read First Time (H) | ||
House | 12/19/2023 | Prefiled (H) |