Senate
|
05/09/2024
|
Voted Do Pass (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2024
|
Executive Session Held (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2024
|
Executive Session Scheduled - AMENDED 2 - Thursday, May 9, 2024, 8:30 a.m., Senate Lounge
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2024
|
Referred: Fiscal Oversight(S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2024
|
SCS Reported Do Pass (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2024
|
SCS Voted Do Pass (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2024
|
Public Hearing Held (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2024
|
Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Monday, April 29, 2024, 2:00 p.m., Senate Committee Room 1.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2024
|
Second read and referred: Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence(S)
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
Reported to the Senate and First Read (S)
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 146 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 5
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
Taken Up for Third Reading (H)
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
Placed on the Informal Third Reading Calendar (H)
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
Voted Do Pass (H)
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
Executive Session Completed (H)
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
Referred: Fiscal Review(H)
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2024
|
Perfected (H)
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2024
|
HCS Adopted (H)
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2024
|
Title of Bill - Agreed To
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2024
|
Taken Up for Perfection (H)
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2024
|
Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2024
|
Placed Back on Formal Perfection Calendar (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 11 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2024
|
HCS Voted Do Pass (H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2024
|
Public Hearing Completed (H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2024
|
Referred: Judiciary(H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/04/2024
|
Read Second Time (H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/03/2024
|
Read First Time (H)
|
|
|
House
|
12/20/2023
|
Prefiled (H)
|
|
|