LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Missouri MO
Legislatures
2024 Regular Session
House
Bills
HB2064
Draft Versions
MO
Missouri House Bill HB2064
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Missouri 2024 Regular Session
Missouri House Bill HB2064
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Fiscal Note
May 6, 2024
Fiscal Note
April 10, 2024
Fiscal Note
March 11, 2024
Fiscal Note
January 23, 2024
Bill
December 20, 2023
Compare
Engrossed
Bill
April 10, 2024
Compare
Comm Sub
Bill
May 6, 2024
Compare
Analysis
April 11, 2024
Analysis
March 6, 2024
Bill
March 4, 2024
Compare
Analysis
January 22, 2024