Senate
|
05/06/2024
|
SCS Reported Do Pass (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2024
|
SCS Voted Do Pass (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2024
|
Executive Session Held (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2024
|
Executive Session Scheduled - AMENDED 2 - Monday, May 6, 2024,1:00 p.m., Senate Committee Room 1.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2024
|
Executive Session Scheduled - Monday, May 6, 2024, 1:00 p.m., Senate Committee Room 1.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2024
|
Executive Session Scheduled - CANCELLED - Thursday, May 2, 2024, 9:45 a.m., Senate Lounge.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2024
|
Executive Session Scheduled - CANCELLED - Wednesday, May 1, 2024, 8:45 a.m., Senate Committee Room 2.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2024
|
Public Hearing Held (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2024
|
Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Monday, April 29, 2024, 2:00 p.m., Senate Lounge.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2024
|
Second read and referred: Local Government and Elections(S)
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2024
|
Reported to the Senate and First Read (S)
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2024
|
Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 146 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2024
|
Taken Up for Third Reading (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2024
|
Placed on the Informal Third Reading Calendar (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
Perfected by Consent - Pursuant to House Rules (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
Reported Do Pass - Consent (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Voted Do Pass - Consent (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2024
|
Executive Session Completed (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2024
|
Referred: Consent and House Procedure(H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2024
|
Action Postponed (H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2024
|
Executive Session Continued
|
|
|
House
|
01/10/2024
|
Public Hearing Completed (H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/04/2024
|
Referred: Government Efficiency and Downsizing(H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/04/2024
|
Read Second Time (H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/03/2024
|
Read First Time (H)
|
|
|
House
|
12/21/2023
|
Prefiled (H)
|
|
|