Missouri 2024 Regular Session

Missouri House Bill HB2084 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note May 6, 2024
Fiscal Note March 12, 2024
Fiscal Note January 5, 2024
Bill December 21, 2023

Engrossed

Bill March 12, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill May 6, 2024
Analysis March 12, 2024
Analysis February 15, 2024
Analysis January 5, 2024