Senate
|
07/12/2024
|
Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/12/2024
|
Approved by Governor (G)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2024
|
Delivered to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2024
|
Signed by President Pro Tem (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2024
|
Signed by House Speaker (H)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2024
|
Senate Message (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2024
|
Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 32 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2024
|
Taken Up for Third Reading (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2024
|
Reported Do Pass (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2024
|
Voted Do Pass (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2024
|
Executive Session Held (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2024
|
Executive Session Scheduled - Thursday, April 11, 2024, 8:45 a.m., Senate Lounge.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2024
|
Public Hearing Held (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2024
|
Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Thursday, April 4, 2024, 9:00 a.m., Senate Lounge
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2024
|
Second read and referred: Governmental Accountability(S)
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Reported to the Senate and First Read (S)
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 145 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Taken Up for Third Reading (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Placed on the Informal Third Reading Calendar (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Perfected (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Title of Bill - Agreed To
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Taken Up for Perfection (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2024
|
Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2024
|
Voted Do Pass (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2024
|
Executive Session Completed (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2024
|
Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2024
|
Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
House
|
01/17/2024
|
Public Hearing Completed (H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/05/2024
|
Referred: Government Efficiency and Downsizing(H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/04/2024
|
Read Second Time (H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/03/2024
|
Read First Time (H)
|
|
|
House
|
12/27/2023
|
Prefiled (H)
|
|
|