Missouri 2024 Regular Session

Missouri House Bill HB2111 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note May 28, 2024
Fiscal Note March 5, 2024
Fiscal Note January 12, 2024
Bill December 27, 2023

Engrossed

Bill March 5, 2024

Enrolled

Bill May 7, 2024

Comm Sub

Analysis May 8, 2024
Analysis March 6, 2024
Analysis January 26, 2024
Analysis January 9, 2024