House | 05/09/2024 | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 5 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0 | ||
House | 05/09/2024 | Voted Do Pass (H) | ||
House | 05/09/2024 | Executive Session Completed (H) | ||
House | 05/08/2024 | Referred: Fiscal Review(H) | ||
House | 05/07/2024 | Perfected (H) | ||
House | 05/07/2024 | Title of Bill - Agreed To | ||
House | 05/07/2024 | Taken Up for Perfection (H) | ||
House | 05/07/2024 | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) | ||
House | 05/02/2024 | Placed Back on Formal Perfection Calendar (H) | ||
House | 03/06/2024 | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 | ||
House | 02/29/2024 | Referred: Rules - Regulatory Oversight(H) | ||
House | 02/27/2024 | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 | ||
House | 02/19/2024 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | ||
House | 02/08/2024 | Referred: Rural Community Development(H) | ||
House | 01/04/2024 | Read Second Time (H) | ||
House | 01/03/2024 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |