Missouri 2024 Regular Session

Missouri House Bill HB2240 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note May 7, 2024
Fiscal Note February 18, 2024
Bill January 3, 2024

Engrossed

Bill May 7, 2024

Comm Sub

Analysis May 7, 2024
Analysis February 28, 2024
Analysis February 8, 2024