Senate
|
04/25/2024
|
Reported Do Pass (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2024
|
Voted Do Pass (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2024
|
Executive Session Held (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2024
|
Executive Session Scheduled - Thursday, April 11, 2024, 8:45 a.m., Senate Lounge.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2024
|
Public Hearing Held (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2024
|
Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Thursday, April 4, 2024, 9:00 a.m., Senate Lounge
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2024
|
Second read and referred: Governmental Accountability(S)
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Reported to the Senate and First Read (S)
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 145 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Taken Up for Third Reading (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Placed on the Informal Third Reading Calendar (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
Perfected (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
HCS Adopted (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
Title of Bill - Agreed To
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
Taken Up for Perfection (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2024
|
Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2024
|
Voted Do Pass (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2024
|
Executive Session Completed (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2024
|
HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 13 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2024
|
HCS Voted Do Pass (H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/23/2024
|
Public Hearing Completed (H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/11/2024
|
Referred: Professional Registration and Licensing(H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/09/2024
|
Read Second Time (H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/08/2024
|
Introduced and Read First Time (H)
|
|
|