Missouri 2024 Regular Session

Missouri House Bill HB2322 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note March 5, 2024
Fiscal Note February 15, 2024
Fiscal Note January 12, 2024
Bill January 8, 2024

Engrossed

Bill March 4, 2024

Comm Sub

Analysis March 5, 2024
Analysis February 15, 2024
Bill February 14, 2024
Analysis January 11, 2024