Senate
|
04/30/2024
|
Public Hearing Held (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2024
|
Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Tuesday, April 30, 2024, 9:00 a.m., Senate Lounge.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2024
|
Second read and referred: Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment(S)
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2024
|
Reported to the Senate and First Read (S)
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2024
|
Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 86 NOES: 53 PRESENT: 6
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2024
|
Taken Up for Third Reading (H)
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2024
|
Placed on the Informal Third Reading Calendar (H)
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
Perfected (H)
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
HCS Adopted (H)
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
Title of Bill - Agreed To
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
Taken Up for Perfection (H)
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H)
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
Placed Back on Formal Perfection Calendar (H)
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2024
|
Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 6 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 1
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2024
|
Voted Do Pass (H)
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2024
|
Executive Session Completed (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2024
|
Motion Adopted - Pursuant to Rule 43. AYES: 122 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 7
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2024
|
Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2024
|
Reported Do Not Pass (H) - AYES: 3 NOES: 5 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2024
|
Motion to Do Pass Failed (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2024
|
HCS Voted Do Pass (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2024
|
Public Hearing Completed (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2024
|
Referred: Special Committee on Innovation and Technology(H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2024
|
Read Second Time (H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2024
|
Introduced and Read First Time (H)
|
|
|