Missouri 2024 Regular Session

Missouri House Bill HB2599 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note April 17, 2024
Fiscal Note March 14, 2024
Fiscal Note February 11, 2024
Bill January 31, 2024

Engrossed

Bill April 17, 2024

Comm Sub

Analysis April 18, 2024
Analysis March 19, 2024
Bill March 13, 2024
Analysis February 8, 2024