House | 05/02/2024 | Placed Back on Formal Perfection Calendar (H) | ||
House | 04/16/2024 | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) | ||
House | 03/04/2024 | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 1 | ||
House | 03/04/2024 | Voted Do Pass (H) | ||
House | 03/04/2024 | Executive Session Completed (H) | ||
House | 02/29/2024 | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) | ||
House | 02/28/2024 | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 | ||
House | 02/27/2024 | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) | ||
House | 02/13/2024 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | ||
House | 02/08/2024 | Referred: Special Committee on Innovation and Technology(H) | ||
House | 02/05/2024 | Read Second Time (H) | ||
House | 02/01/2024 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |